NY S02912 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender long-term care facility residents' bill of rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender long-term care facility residents' bill of rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2912B
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1100
2019-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 2912A
2019-05-10SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGING
2019-01-30SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A00866 (Same As) 2019-06-07 - print number 866b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback