NY S02924 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Marshall plan for moms interagency task force to examine, issue proposals and make recommendations on multiple policy areas to address the disproportionate burden mothers have weathered from the economic fallout of the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Establishes the Marshall plan for moms interagency task force to examine, issue proposals and make recommendations on multiple policy areas to address the disproportionate burden mothers have weathered from the economic fallout of the COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.528 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.418 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07895 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations