NY S02937 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons who have been convicted of animal cruelty from working at an animal shelter; makes such violation a class A misdemeanor.
Title
Prohibits persons who have been convicted of animal cruelty from working at an animal shelter; makes such violation a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-04-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.665 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.937 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03903 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to agriculture