NY S02950 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the eighth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.
Title
Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the eighth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02064 (Same As) 2017-05-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS