NY S02977 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a person who intentionally obstructs the efforts of any firefighter performing emergency medical care on a sick or injured person is guilty of the crime of obstructing firefighting operations.
Title
Establishes a person who intentionally obstructs the efforts of any firefighter performing emergency medical care on a sick or injured person is guilty of the crime of obstructing firefighting operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.977 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.852 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03643 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes