NY S02978 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fines and penalties for passing a stopped school bus.
Title
Increases fines and penalties for passing a stopped school bus.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Marc Panepinto [D] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.910 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.866 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07130 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation