NY S02980 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the granting of a real property tax exemption for persons 65 years of age or older who are tenants residing in a manufactured home park in certain municipal corporations and school districts.
Title
Authorizes the granting of a real property tax exemption for persons 65 years of age or older who are tenants residing in a manufactured home park in certain municipal corporations and school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2980A |
2018-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.378 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A02339 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 2339a