NY S03040 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3040A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3040A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that juniors and seniors at secondary schools must take a financial literacy and personal finances course.
Title
Provides that juniors and seniors at secondary schools must take a financial literacy and personal finances course.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3040A |
2014-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04142 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - print number 4142a