NY S03054 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3054A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3054A
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-time personal income tax credit for up to $10,000 for the expenses incurred by a resident taxpayer in the course of donating his or her organs for transplantation; repeals the personal income tax modification, reducing federal adjusted income, for such expenses.
Title
Establishes a one-time personal income tax credit for up to $10,000 for the expenses incurred by a resident taxpayer in the course of donating his or her organs for transplantation; repeals the personal income tax modification, reducing federal adjusted income, for such expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3054A |
2022-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A09063 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - referred to ways and means