NY S03058 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring nonpublic schools to follow the same rules and regulations as public schools regarding a pupil who suffers a concussion, regarding training to recognize the symptoms of a concussion, information to be provided to the parent or guardian of such pupil and the amount of time such pupil shall wait before resuming an athletic activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring nonpublic schools to follow the same rules and regulations as public schools regarding a pupil who suffers a concussion, regarding training to recognize the symptoms of a concussion, information to be provided to the parent or guardian of such pupil and the amount of time such pupil shall wait before resuming an athletic activity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.707
2019-02-01SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A05887 (Same As) 2019-02-20 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback