NY S03137 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to lease county land for natural gas exploration, development and production for five years or as long as gas is produced in paying quantities.
Title
Authorizes counties to lease county land for natural gas exploration, development and production for five years or as long as gas is produced in paying quantities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3137A |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.343 |
2011-04-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07300 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation