NY S03137 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7967B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7967B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to veterans' health care options and requires the division of veterans' affairs to post certain information on its website.
Title
Relates to veterans' health care options and requires the division of veterans' affairs to post certain information on its website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7967B |
2016-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3137C |
2016-05-16 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-16 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-23 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2016-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.360 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3137B |
2016-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3137A |
2015-06-09 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2015-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07967 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - signed chap.64