NY S03141 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - signed chap.418
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - signed chap.418
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to watchers during election; provides that any candidate on the ballot and any political committee may have for each election district three watchers at any one time, not more than one of whom may be within the guard rail at any one time.
Title
Relates to watchers during election; provides that any candidate on the ballot and any political committee may have for each election district three watchers at any one time, not more than one of whom may be within the guard rail at any one time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | signed chap.418 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1242 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3141A |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.383 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-06 | Senate | print number 1525a |
2019-05-06 | Senate | amend and recommit to election law |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1525A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1242 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3141A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01525 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - signed chap.418