NY S03145 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no candy or confection sold in this state shall be packaged, shaped or manufactured to resemble marijuana or marijuana products or to imitate the flavor of marijuana.
Title
Provides that no candy or confection sold in this state shall be packaged, shaped or manufactured to resemble marijuana or marijuana products or to imitate the flavor of marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2011-02-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2011-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04318 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to consumer affairs and protection