NY S03145 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certification as a clinical nurse specialist (CNS).
Title
Relates to certification as a clinical nurse specialist (CNS).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.364 |
2013-09-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a826 |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1250 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00826 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - substituted by s3145