NY S03178 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Ildefonso Romero's law" to establish the felony offenses of aggravated assault for the causation of serious physical injury to or death of, as the case may be, of any person, with intent to cause physical injury to such person or a third person.
Title
Enacts "Ildefonso Romero's law" to establish the felony offenses of aggravated assault for the causation of serious physical injury to or death of, as the case may be, of any person, with intent to cause physical injury to such person or a third person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.352 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3178A |
2015-05-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.853 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05171 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes