NY S03186 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Brendan's law"; requires child day care centers and certain other facilities installing new or replacement window coverings to install cordless window coverings; requires child day care centers and certain other facilities that have window coverings in place before the effective date of this section to meet safety standards established in ANSI/WCMA A 100.1-2012 or any successor standard.
Title
Establishes "Brendan's law"; requires child day care centers and certain other facilities installing new or replacement window coverings to install cordless window coverings; requires child day care centers and certain other facilities that have window coverings in place before the effective date of this section to meet safety standards established in ANSI/WCMA A 100.1-2012 or any successor standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.218 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.231 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a168a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3186A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.543 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00168 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES