NY S03230 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds additional factors to be considered by the department of health for applications for a license to operate a bank or storage facility.
Title
Adds additional factors to be considered by the department of health for applications for a license to operate a bank or storage facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1326 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3230A |
2023-03-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2023-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00117 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - REFERRED TO HEALTH