NY S03233 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 3233A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 3233A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force of thirteen people to study the feasibility of establishing a new college of the state university at the Southampton campus of Stony Brook University; requires a public hearing; further requires a report of recommendations to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly on or before December 1, 2013.
Title
Establishes a task force of thirteen people to study the feasibility of establishing a new college of the state university at the Southampton campus of Stony Brook University; requires a public hearing; further requires a report of recommendations to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly on or before December 1, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3233A |
2012-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2011-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05121 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - print number 5121a