NY S03329 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 3329A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 3329A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the safety of funeral processions; provides that vehicles participating in funeral procession shall have the right-of-way; makes it illegal for any vehicle to forcefully enter spaces between vehicles in a procession; provides that vehicles entering a procession illegally shall be subject to a civil fine of up to $100; provides that drivers in a funeral procession must exercise reasonable duty of care and shall yield the right-of-way to emergency vehicles with siren or lights activated.
Title
Relates to the safety of funeral processions; provides that vehicles participating in funeral procession shall have the right-of-way; makes it illegal for any vehicle to forcefully enter spaces between vehicles in a procession; provides that vehicles entering a procession illegally shall be subject to a civil fine of up to $100; provides that drivers in a funeral procession must exercise reasonable duty of care and shall yield the right-of-way to emergency vehicles with siren or lights activated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3329A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-12 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04082 (Same As) 2012-05-21 - print number 4082a