NY S03395 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2483B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2483B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the state and all public employers as employers subject to the provisions of the human rights law; includes executive, legislative and judicial employers.
Title
Includes the state and all public employers as employers subject to the provisions of the human rights law; includes executive, legislative and judicial employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2483B |
2022-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.386 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | AMENDED 3395A |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02483 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - signed chap.139