NY S03412 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3412A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3412A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits voting by the legislature between the hours of 9:00 pm and 9:00 am.
Title
Prohibits voting by the legislature between the hours of 9:00 pm and 9:00 am.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3412A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-03-20 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2013-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07103 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - print number 7103a