NY S03431 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promoting animal fighting and appropriately punishing individuals associated with such activities.
Title
Relates to promoting animal fighting and appropriately punishing individuals associated with such activities.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2024-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.746 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3431A |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.676 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01148 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - recommitted to agriculture