NY S03443 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assessment of real property used to store spent nuclear fuel.
Title
Relates to the assessment of real property used to store spent nuclear fuel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.273 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3443A |
2020-01-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.566 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05404 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means