NY S03447 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the management of the Roosevelt Island operating corporation.
Title
Relates to the management of the Roosevelt Island operating corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3447A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05601 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO CITIES