NY S03459 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.190
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pediatric day-respite centers and care and the reimbursement for services at such centers.
Title
Establishes pediatric day-respite centers and care and the reimbursement for services at such centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.190 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.432 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a2187a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1447 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3459A |
2017-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02187 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s3459a