NY S03467 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a licensed pharmacist to order and administer certain tests.
Title
Allows a licensed pharmacist to order and administer certain tests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.167 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-12-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3467A |
2023-12-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06627 (Same As) 2024-01-05 - print number 6627b