NY S03511 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3511A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3511A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a small business electric energy tax credit; the term "business related electricity usage" shall refer to electrical power usage to further the economic activity of the taxpayer at the primary business location that is clearly delimited from any shared electrical power usage cost.
Title
Creates a small business electric energy tax credit; the term "business related electricity usage" shall refer to electrical power usage to further the economic activity of the taxpayer at the primary business location that is clearly delimited from any shared electrical power usage cost.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3511A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06679 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 6679a