NY S03516 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3516A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3516A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirement for policyholders to provide notice to withdraw from the state insurance fund.
Title
Relates to the requirement for policyholders to provide notice to withdraw from the state insurance fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Bob Antonacci [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3516A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A04350 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO LABOR