NY S03518 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the manufacturer disclosure and transparency act requiring prescription drug manufacturers to notify the attorney general of arrangements between pharmaceutical manufacturers resulting in the delay of the introduction of generic medications.
Title
Enacts the manufacturer disclosure and transparency act requiring prescription drug manufacturers to notify the attorney general of arrangements between pharmaceutical manufacturers resulting in the delay of the introduction of generic medications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2024-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.112 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00895 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to consumer affairs and protection