NY S03580 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to approval, denial and renewal of casino and gaming employee licenses and registrations.
Title
Relates to approval, denial and renewal of casino and gaming employee licenses and registrations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.221 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.677 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a6793 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.344 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A06793 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s3580