NY S03586 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3403A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3403A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the staff sergeant Alex R. Jimenez New York state military immigrant family legacy program within the department of veterans' services.
Title
Establishes the staff sergeant Alex R. Jimenez New York state military immigrant family legacy program within the department of veterans' services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3403A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3586A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1087 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A03403 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - tabled