NY S03664 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts services rendered with respect to the maintenance and repair of trucks having a gross weight exceeding 33,000 pounds from the state portion of the sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Exempts services rendered with respect to the maintenance and repair of trucks having a gross weight exceeding 33,000 pounds from the state portion of the sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3664A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05051 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means