NY S03697 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 3697A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - PRINT NUMBER 3697A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the salaries of certain teachers and aids employed by boards of cooperative educational services.
Title
Relates to the salaries of certain teachers and aids employed by boards of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. George Latimer [D] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3697A |
2016-02-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03885 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - print number 3885a