NY S03739 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to joint purchases of goods, supplies and services by fire corporations.
Title
Relates to joint purchases of goods, supplies and services by fire corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.407 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.461 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10279a |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1291 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3739A |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10279 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s3739a