NY S03827 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-01 - PRINT NUMBER 3827A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-01 - PRINT NUMBER 3827A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary state commission to be known as the commission on public authority reform to study and investigate reducing the number of public authorities and their subsidiaries in New York state; requires reporting; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Title
Establishes a temporary state commission to be known as the commission on public authority reform to study and investigate reducing the number of public authorities and their subsidiaries in New York state; requires reporting; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | PRINT NUMBER 3827A | |
2010-04-01 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2010-03-04 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-02 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A3114 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions