NY S03887 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.163
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.163
Summary
Relates to the value limitations on contracts; extends the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the value limitations on contracts; extends the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Craig Johnson [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8315 | |
2009-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.664 | |
2009-06-30 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-04-02 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08315 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.163
S60405 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65004 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S60405 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65004 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03887&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |