NY S03888 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mercury-added consumer products.
Title
Relates to mercury-added consumer products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A668 |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.345 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00668 (Same As) 2011-05-17 - signed chap.20