NY S03906 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.292
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.292
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Hamburg, county of Erie to discontinue the use of certain town lands as parkland and to sell and convey such lands to James Cleary.
Title
Authorizes the town of Hamburg, county of Erie to discontinue the use of certain town lands as parkland and to sell and convey such lands to James Cleary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.292 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.114 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a5394a |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.830 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3906A |
2015-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05394 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - substituted by s3906a