NY S03906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New York state veterans cemetery act"; directs the division to conduct an investigation and study on the issue of the establishment of a New York state veterans cemetery funding program.
Title
Establishes the "New York state veterans cemetery act"; directs the division to conduct an investigation and study on the issue of the establishment of a New York state veterans cemetery funding program.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2018-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1178 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1265 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A03364 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to veterans' affairs