NY S03922 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3922A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3922A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to attachment to the labor market in temporary partial disability cases.
Title
Relates to attachment to the labor market in temporary partial disability cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3922A |
2018-04-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A04546 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to labor
A09718 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.1020
A09718 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.1020