NY S03927 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Hendrick Hudson central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Hendrick Hudson central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.163 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.289 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a5737 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1455 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05737 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s3927