NY S03959 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the statute of limitations on class B violent felonies.
Title
Eliminates the statute of limitations on class B violent felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-11-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3959A |
2013-11-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09181 (Same As) 2014-03-26 - referred to codes