NY S03992 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the higher education community service act to promote volunteer service by higher education students; creates a council for higher education community service to regulate and recognize persons and programs associated therewith; requires a report to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly.
Title
Enacts the higher education community service act to promote volunteer service by higher education students; creates a council for higher education community service to regulate and recognize persons and programs associated therewith; requires a report to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1112 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04607 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education