NY S04008 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to immunity from civil liability for emergency removal of a child from a motor vehicle.
Title
Relates to immunity from civil liability for emergency removal of a child from a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.209 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01238 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation