NY S04019 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Schoharie until 2015.
Title
Extends the authorization for additional sales tax in the county of Schoharie until 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6315 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.851 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06315 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - signed chap.319