NY S04033 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a clinical preceptorship personal income tax credit for certain health care professionals who provide preceptor instruction to students studying to be a health care professional.
Title
Establishes a clinical preceptorship personal income tax credit for certain health care professionals who provide preceptor instruction to students studying to be a health care professional.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4033A |
2019-02-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A03704 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means