NY S04070 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to reduction of positions based upon seniority for sworn members of the division of correction of the sheriff's department of the county of Nassau; provides that abolition of positions or reduction in rank or salary grade shall be made in the inverse order of original appointment.
Title
Enacts provisions relating to reduction of positions based upon seniority for sworn members of the division of correction of the sheriff's department of the county of Nassau; provides that abolition of positions or reduction in rank or salary grade shall be made in the inverse order of original appointment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7125 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.937 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07125 (Same As) 2013-11-13 - signed chap.484