NY S04086 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a defense for underage sale of alcoholic beverages to licensees which perform transaction scans and have no violations for 2 years.
Title
Establishes a defense for underage sale of alcoholic beverages to licensees which perform transaction scans and have no violations for 2 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.254 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.251 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A06690 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to economic development