NY S04096 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Deposit, in the county of Broome, to employ Jay Vandermark, Jr. as a part-time police officer on a noncompetitive basis, notwithstanding that Mr. Vandermark is employed on a full-time basis as an equipment operator.
Title
Authorizes the village of Deposit, in the county of Broome, to employ Jay Vandermark, Jr. as a part-time police officer on a noncompetitive basis, notwithstanding that Mr. Vandermark is employed on a full-time basis as an equipment operator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.290 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6812 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.784 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1337 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06812 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s4096